TN HB2912 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Pr. Ch. 65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Pr. Ch. 65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, creates the Rutherford County Board of Juvenile Detention Center Commissioners.
Title
AN ACT to establish the Rutherford County Board of Juvenile Detention Center Commissioners to oversee and supervise the Rutherford County Juvenile Detention Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Pr. Ch. 65 | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/18/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2928 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 65