TN HB2892 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to grant or deny an application for a subsurface sewage disposal system within 45 days or receiving all information necessary to make such a determination; requires the department, if it cannot make a determination within 45 days, to refund the application fee; requires that a denial include a clear, written explanation for the denial with citations to relevant legal authority for the denial. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 11; Section 39-14-306; Section 57-4-102; Title 59; Title 62; Title 66; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, requires the department to grant or deny an application for a subsurface sewage disposal system within 45 days or receiving all information necessary to make such a determination; requires the department, if it cannot make a determination within 45 days, to refund the application fee; requires that a denial include a clear, written explanation for the denial with citations to relevant legal authority for the denial. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 11; Section 39-14-306; Section 57-4-102; Title 59; Title 62; Title 66; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 726 | |
2020-06-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2119 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 726