TN SB2119 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to grant or deny an application for a subsurface sewage disposal system within 45 days or receiving all information necessary to make such a determination; requires the department, if it cannot make a determination within 45 days, to refund the application fee; requires that a denial include a clear, written explanation for the denial with citations to relevant legal authority for the denial. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 11; Section 39-14-306; Section 57-4-102; Title 59; Title 62; Title 66; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, requires the department to grant or deny an application for a subsurface sewage disposal system within 45 days or receiving all information necessary to make such a determination; requires the department, if it cannot make a determination within 45 days, to refund the application fee; requires that a denial include a clear, written explanation for the denial with citations to relevant legal authority for the denial. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 11; Section 39-14-306; Section 57-4-102; Title 59; Title 62; Title 66; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 726 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0789) |
2020-06-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0553) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2892 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 726