TN HB2888 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes it a Class A misdemeanor for any person, including any individual or entity, to knowingly prepare, sign, or file any lien or other document with the intent to encumber any real or personal property when such person has no reasonable basis or any legal cause to place such lien or encumbrance on such real or personal property. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, makes it a Class A misdemeanor for any person, including any individual or entity, to knowingly prepare, sign, or file any lien or other document with the intent to encumber any real or personal property when such person has no reasonable basis or any legal cause to place such lien or encumbrance on such real or personal property. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1015 | |
2012-04-26 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-24 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-03-20 | Sponsor change. | |
2012-03-20 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 2/29/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to s/c Judiciary Subcommittee | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2890 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 1015