TN HB2868 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, terminates the department of environment and conservation on June 30, 2020, causing the department to go into a one-year wind down period and cease to exist on June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, terminates the department of environment and conservation on June 30, 2020, causing the department to go into a one-year wind down period and cease to exist on June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2649 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee