TN SB2649 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, terminates the department of environment and conservation on June 30, 2020, causing the department to go into a one-year wind down period and cease to exist on June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, terminates the department of environment and conservation on June 30, 2020, causing the department to go into a one-year wind down period and cease to exist on June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2868 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee