TN HB2867 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines physician to mean a person licensed in this state and in good standing, for purposes of requiring an owner or lessee of a motor vehicle who is deaf or hard of hearing and who seeks to request a designation in the VTRS database by application coupled with a physician's statement. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 21 and Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, defines physician to mean a person licensed in this state and in good standing, for purposes of requiring an owner or lessee of a motor vehicle who is deaf or hard of hearing and who seeks to request a designation in the VTRS database by application coupled with a physician's statement. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 21 and Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0842) |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Safety & Funding Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2714 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0