TN HB2865 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1146
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1146
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds continuing education requirements for members of utility district board of commissioners; and rewrites provisions for utility district commissioners' removal from office and filling of vacancies. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 3; Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 6 and Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 7.
Title
As enacted, adds continuing education requirements for members of utility district board of commissioners; and rewrites provisions for utility district commissioners' removal from office and filling of vacancies. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 3; Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 6 and Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1146 | |
2010-06-04 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/3/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 3/17/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 3/10/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 2/24/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3513 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1146
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2865&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2865.pdf |