TN HB2851 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1130
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1130
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the fees for court officers in Wilson County for attending on grand jury or waiting in court from $75.00 to $100 and establishes the fee as a minimum; authorizes the county legislative body of such county to increase the fee by resolution no more than once annually. - Amends Title 8, Chapter 21, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, increases the fees for court officers in Wilson County for attending on grand jury or waiting in court from $75.00 to $100 and establishes the fee as a minimum; authorizes the county legislative body of such county to increase the fee by resolution no more than once annually. - Amends Title 8, Chapter 21, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1130 | |
2010-06-08 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-06-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #3 for 6/03/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 3/17/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-02-23 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3495 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1130
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2851&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2851.pdf |