TN HB2850 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Meeting Canceled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the amount of marijuana possessed or exchanged under the offenses of simple possession or casual exchange from less than one-half ounce to less than one ounce; prohibits the inference of purpose of selling or otherwise dispensing solely from the simple possession or casual exchange of less than one ounce of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases the amount of marijuana possessed or exchanged under the offenses of simple possession or casual exchange from less than one-half ounce to less than one ounce; prohibits the inference of purpose of selling or otherwise dispensing solely from the simple possession or casual exchange of less than one ounce of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2613 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback