TN HB2833 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the Restoration of Dignity for the Elderly Act, which requires the department to create a five-year pilot program for the release of elderly inmates to home detention; defines an elderly inmate as a person who is 60 years of age or older, has served a minimum of 65 percent of the sentence imposed, is not serving a sentence for a violent sexual offense or more than one conviction for first degree murder or facilitation of first degree murder, and is not serving a sentence of imprisonment for life without parole. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to the release of offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2757 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee