TN HB2833 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes , from January 1 to January 15, the date by which the commissioner of revenue must submit an annual report regarding franchise and excise tax credits for gross premiums and jobs to the finance, ways and means committees of the house of representatives and the senate. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, changes , from January 1 to January 15, the date by which the commissioner of revenue must submit an annual report regarding franchise and excise tax credits for gross premiums and jobs to the finance, ways and means committees of the house of representatives and the senate. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2606 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Subcommittee