TN HB2815 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a veteran's service officer to maintain a record of each oath administered to and acknowledgment taken from an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces for a period of not less than one year. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 3, relative to veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2642 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee