TN HB2795 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a health insurance entity on health plans issued, delivered, executed, amended, or renewed on or after July 1, 2020, to include in that health plan a special enrollment period that allows the enrollment of a pregnant individual at any time after the commencement of the pregnancy as certified by a healthcare professional acting within the healthcare professional's scope of practice. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires a health insurance entity on health plans issued, delivered, executed, amended, or renewed on or after July 1, 2020, to include in that health plan a special enrollment period that allows the enrollment of a pregnant individual at any time after the commencement of the pregnancy as certified by a healthcare professional acting within the healthcare professional's scope of practice. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2640 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee