TN HB2769 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of education, subject to appropriations, for the 2024-2025 school year, to approve voluntary pre-kindergarten programs in an amount sufficient to provide up to 1,200 pre-kindergarten classrooms. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2754 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee