TN HB2757 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pr. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pr. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, amends the charter to specify the timetable and manner of elections of the mayor and five aldermen, to alter the requirement of qualified voters having to live in the town for 30 days preceding an election, to change the required reading of a bill or ordinance from three readings to two, and to delete language that allows the fire chief to be the chief of police and vice versa. - Amends amend Chapter 150 of the Private Acts of 1994; and any other acts amendatory thereto.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, amends the charter to specify the timetable and manner of elections of the mayor and five aldermen, to alter the requirement of qualified voters having to live in the town for 30 days preceding an election, to change the required reading of a bill or ordinance from three readings to two, and to delete language that allows the fire chief to be the chief of police and vice versa. - Amends amend Chapter 150 of the Private Acts of 1994; and any other acts amendatory thereto.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Bass [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Pr. Ch. 42 | |
2010-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-04-05 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-01 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-03-31 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-31 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-03-24 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-03-22 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/22/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/18/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-03-01 | Re-ref. to Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-03-01 | Objected to on Consent Calendar. | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/1/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 02/25/2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 02/16/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 2/16/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 02/09/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Re-ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-01 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/03/10 | |
2010-02-01 | Objected to on Consent Calendar. | |
2010-01-29 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/01/10 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C held on desk. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2512 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 42
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2757&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2757.pdf |