TN HB2750 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1137
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1137
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes date on which state coordinator of elections must publicly calculate and compare the votes received by each person and declare who has been nominated for office in a primary election or elected to the state executive committee; changes the time of which a voting machine must remain locked. - Amends TCA Section 2-2-115(b)(3); Section 2-2-124(a); Section 2-8-113(a) and Section 2-9-108.
Title
As enacted, changes date on which state coordinator of elections must publicly calculate and compare the votes received by each person and declare who has been nominated for office in a primary election or elected to the state executive committee; changes the time of which a voting machine must remain locked. - Amends TCA Section 2-2-115(b)(3); Section 2-2-124(a); Section 2-8-113(a) and Section 2-9-108.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1137 | |
2010-06-04 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/3/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2684 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1137
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2750&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2750.pdf |