TN HB2747 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Artificial Intelligence Advisory Council Act." - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, relative to the "Tennessee Artificial Intelligence Advisory Council Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2678 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee