TN SB2678 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Artificial Intelligence Advisory Council Act." - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, relative to the "Tennessee Artificial Intelligence Advisory Council Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2747 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee