TN HB2740 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of special purpose plates for retired members of the general assembly and their families; fee for such plates is $25.00. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes issuance of special purpose plates for retired members of the general assembly and their families; fee for such plates is $25.00. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Action def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/28/2010 Mtg. canceled | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Action Def. in Transportation Committee to 3/9/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 02/16/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2626 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-27 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2740&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2740.pdf |