TN HB2711 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from 10 to 14 days, the period within which an individual education program meeting must be convened following the use of isolation or restraint. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, extends, from 10 to 14 days, the period within which an individual education program meeting must be convened following the use of isolation or restraint. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2820 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee