TN HB2697 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a person who holds a valid license to instruct in a school of cosmetology and who completes 300 hours in a registered barber school or college regarding the fundamentals of straight razor shaving and barbering technique, to be issued a certificate of registration as a barber instructor; authorizes a person who holds a valid registration as a barber instructor and who completes 300 hours in a licensed school of cosmetology learning the fundamentals of cosmetology technique and pedicuring, to be issued a license to instruct in a school of cosmetology. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4, relative to professions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 955 | |
2022-04-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0697) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 17, PNV 1 |
2022-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0606) |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-22 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2754 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 955