TN SB2754 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 955
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 955
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a person who holds a valid license to instruct in a school of cosmetology and who completes 300 hours in a registered barber school or college regarding the fundamentals of straight razor shaving and barbering technique, to be issued a certificate of registration as a barber instructor; authorizes a person who holds a valid registration as a barber instructor and who completes 300 hours in a licensed school of cosmetology learning the fundamentals of cosmetology technique and pedicuring, to be issued a license to instruct in a school of cosmetology. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4, relative to professions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 955 | |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2697 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022