TN HB2692 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 950
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 950
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates The Caverns in Grundy County and the South Jackson Civic Center in Tullahoma as a premier type tourist resorts for purposes of selling alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As enacted, designates The Caverns in Grundy County and the South Jackson Civic Center in Tullahoma as a premier type tourist resorts for purposes of selling alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 950 | |
2018-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to Next Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-02-05 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2088 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
SB2706 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 950
SB2706 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 950