TN HB2665 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a court to order a child who is adjudicated as a traffic violator, in addition to the child's parent or legal guardian, to pay a fine of not more than $50. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 37 and Title 41, relative to juveniles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2507 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.