TN HB2635 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, authorizes the county commission to set the compensation for the county attorney; reduces the term of office of the county attorney from four years to one year; authorizes the county mayor to retain counsel for extraordinary legal matters. - Amends Chapter 255 of the Private Acts of 1931.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, authorizes the county commission to set the compensation for the county attorney; reduces the term of office of the county attorney from four years to one year; authorizes the county mayor to retain counsel for extraordinary legal matters. - Amends Chapter 255 of the Private Acts of 1931.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Doss [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Pr. Ch. 36 | |
2016-04-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2661 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-21 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36