TN HB2626 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing access to investigative records of the Tennessee bureau of investigation by certain members and committees of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing access to investigative records of the Tennessee bureau of investigation by certain members and committees of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 2 by Norris (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 2 by Norris (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1060 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-25 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 84, Nays 0 PNV 1 HB2626 |
2018-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-25 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1200) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1202) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 67, Nays 19, PNV 0 |
2018-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1135) |
2018-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Held on desk. |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2630 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1060