TN SB2630 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing access to investigative records of the Tennessee bureau of investigation by certain members and committees of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing access to investigative records of the Tennessee bureau of investigation by certain members and committees of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1060
2018-04-26SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-25SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/25/2018
2018-04-19SenateRe-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018
2018-04-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018
2018-04-17SenateSenate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-03-28SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018
2018-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018
2018-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2626 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1060

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback