TN HB2609 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits certain healthcare providers and entities from discriminating against qualified persons for receipt of transplantations or anatomical gifts based solely on disability; prohibits insurers that offer plans covering transplantations from denying coverage solely on disability. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, prohibits certain healthcare providers and entities from discriminating against qualified persons for receipt of transplantations or anatomical gifts based solely on disability; prohibits insurers that offer plans covering transplantations from denying coverage solely on disability. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Insurance |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2776 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee