TN HB2602 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the administrator of a recovery high school to provide the department of education and the state board of education an annual report, which includes not only the school's overall high school graduation rate but its overall graduation rate as compared to the overall graduation rate of other high schools in the state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the administrator of a recovery high school to provide the department of education and the state board of education an annual report, which includes not only the school's overall high school graduation rate but its overall graduation rate as compared to the overall graduation rate of other high schools in the state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-05-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2519 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020