TN SB2519 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the administrator of a recovery high school to provide the department of education and the state board of education an annual report, which includes not only the school's overall high school graduation rate but its overall graduation rate as compared to the overall graduation rate of other high schools in the state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the administrator of a recovery high school to provide the department of education and the state board of education an annual report, which includes not only the school's overall high school graduation rate but its overall graduation rate as compared to the overall graduation rate of other high schools in the state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2602 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-04 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee