TN HB2594 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-08 - Conf. comm. appointed. (Lynn, Favors & Shepard)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-08 - Conf. comm. appointed. (Lynn, Favors & Shepard)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the board of examiners for nursing home administrators, June 30, 2011. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 16, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, extends the board of examiners for nursing home administrators, June 30, 2011. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 16, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Conf. comm. appointed. (Lynn, Favors & Shepard) | |
2010-06-08 | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence in S. am. no. 2 | |
2010-06-07 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Reset on Message cal. for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Message cal. for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-02 | H. Placed on Tentative Message Calendar for 6/03/10 | |
2010-06-02 | Reset on Message cal. for 6/03/10 | |
2010-05-28 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/02/10 | |
2010-05-27 | S. refused to recede from am. 2 | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 2 | |
2010-05-21 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/24/10 | |
2010-05-13 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 22, Nays 1 | |
2010-05-13 | S. adopted am. 2 | |
2010-05-13 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-03-17 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-15 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-15 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0977) | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/11/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2445 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-13 - Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1300)