TN HB2590 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows an elected official of any county or municipality in the actual discharge of official duties who has a valid handgun carry permit to carry inside a building in which judicial proceedings are in progress, but not in the room in which judicial proceedings are in progress; allows the county attorney in the actual discharge of official duties who has a valid handgun carry permit to carry inside a building in which judicial proceedings are in progress, but not in the room in which judicial proceedings are in progress. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, allows an elected official of any county or municipality in the actual discharge of official duties who has a valid handgun carry permit to carry inside a building in which judicial proceedings are in progress, but not in the room in which judicial proceedings are in progress; allows the county attorney in the actual discharge of official duties who has a valid handgun carry permit to carry inside a building in which judicial proceedings are in progress, but not in the room in which judicial proceedings are in progress. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 681 | |
2020-06-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-19 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2066 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 681