TN HB2580 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes the offense of theft of a firearm, which is graded as one classification higher than the value of the firearm under the grading of theft. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, establishes the offense of theft of a firearm, which is graded as one classification higher than the value of the firearm under the grading of theft. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee--Criminal Justice |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1855 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2580&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2580.pdf |