TN HB2576 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the provision of sexual identity change therapy to prepubescent minors; prohibits the provision of sexual identity change therapy to minors who have entered puberty unless a parent or guardian has written recommendations for the therapy from at least three physicians; punishes violations as child abuse; designates violations by healthcare professionals as professional misconduct. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 49; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits the provision of sexual identity change therapy to prepubescent minors; prohibits the provision of sexual identity change therapy to minors who have entered puberty unless a parent or guardian has written recommendations for the therapy from at least three physicians; punishes violations as child abuse; designates violations by healthcare professionals as professional misconduct. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 49; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseReset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 6/9/2020
2020-06-02HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020
2020-05-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary-- Health
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2215 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback