TN SB2215 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the provision of sexual identity change therapy to prepubescent minors; prohibits the provision of sexual identity change therapy to minors who have entered puberty unless a parent or guardian has written recommendations for the therapy from at least three physicians; punishes violations as child abuse; designates violations by healthcare professionals as professional misconduct. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 49; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits the provision of sexual identity change therapy to prepubescent minors; prohibits the provision of sexual identity change therapy to minors who have entered puberty unless a parent or guardian has written recommendations for the therapy from at least three physicians; punishes violations as child abuse; designates violations by healthcare professionals as professional misconduct. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 49; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
2020-06-08SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020
2020-06-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
2020-06-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2576 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback