TN HB2571 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2016," which revises regulation of controlled substances; makes permanent most all of the changes made under the Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2012, and revises and enacts other provisions. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 63, Chapter 1; Chapter 791 of the Public Acts of 2014 and Chapter 880 of the Public Acts of 2012.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2016," which revises regulation of controlled substances; makes permanent most all of the changes made under the Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2012, and revises and enacts other provisions. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 63, Chapter 1; Chapter 791 of the Public Acts of 2014 and Chapter 880 of the Public Acts of 2012.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002 | |
2016-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Criminal Justice--Government Operations for review |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2552 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1002
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2571&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2571.pdf |