TN SB2552 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2016," which revises regulation of controlled substances; makes permanent most all of the changes made under the Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2012, and revises and enacts other provisions. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 63, Chapter 1; Chapter 791 of the Public Acts of 2014 and Chapter 880 of the Public Acts of 2012.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2016," which revises regulation of controlled substances; makes permanent most all of the changes made under the Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2012, and revises and enacts other provisions. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 63, Chapter 1; Chapter 791 of the Public Acts of 2014 and Chapter 880 of the Public Acts of 2012.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 1002 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA1111) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA1088) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1111) |
2016-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1088) |
2016-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0756) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2571 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002