TN HB2563 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person with knowledge of faulty electrical work performed by a limited licensed electrician to notify the board of licensing contractors within three business days from the date the person knows of the faulty electrical work. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Title
As introduced, requires a person with knowledge of faulty electrical work performed by a limited licensed electrician to notify the board of licensing contractors within three business days from the date the person knows of the faulty electrical work. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2865 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee