PA SB1018 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Act No. 23 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Act No. 23 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 2 (Administrative Law and Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in practice and procedure, providing for child victims and witnesses.
Title
In practice and procedure, providing for child victims and witnesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - House - House Floor: SB 1018 PN 1275, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 133 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1018 PN 1275, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - House - House Floor: SB 1018 PN 1275, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 133 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1018 PN 1275, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | House | Act No. 23 of 2024 |
2024-06-10 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2024-06-05 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2024-06-05 | House | Signed in House |
2024-06-04 | House | Signed in Senate |
2024-06-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (133-69) |
2024-06-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-05-22 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-05-22 | House | Second consideration |
2024-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2024-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2024-04-10 | House | In the House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |