TN HB2539 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that an order of restitution entered in a criminal action is a final civil judgment upon entry of the order; makes various other changes in regard to restitution for victims of crime. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, specifies that an order of restitution entered in a criminal action is a final civil judgment upon entry of the order; makes various other changes in regard to restitution for victims of crime. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2452 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020