TN HB2508 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Def. to Summer Study in Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Def. to Summer Study in Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises various provisions relating to the duty to notify consumers when there is a breach of system security that contains the consumers' personal identifying information. - Amends TCA Section 47-18-2107.
Title
As introduced, revises various provisions relating to the duty to notify consumers when there is a breach of system security that contains the consumers' personal identifying information. - Amends TCA Section 47-18-2107.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2536 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0