TN HB2500 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 917
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 917
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies how proceeds from the sale and conveyance of surplus real property or improvements used for state forestry or other operations of the department of agriculture are to be used; revises other various statutory provisions required for implementation of the annual appropriations act, including provisions regarding carry forwards and transfers of funds to the general fund. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 7.
Title
As enacted, specifies how proceeds from the sale and conveyance of surplus real property or improvements used for state forestry or other operations of the department of agriculture are to be used; revises other various statutory provisions required for implementation of the annual appropriations act, including provisions regarding carry forwards and transfers of funds to the general fund. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 3 BY Kyle (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Appropriations Calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 3 BY Kyle (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Appropriations Calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 917 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Effective date(s) 05/13/2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2, Ayes 59, Nays 31 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Reset on Messgae cal. for 4/15/14 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. adopted am. #2 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-04-10 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-04-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 18 |
2014-04-10 | House | Am. no. 2 tabled, Ayes 70, Nays 26 |
2014-04-10 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1221) |
2014-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2597 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 917