TN HB2484 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to maintain any record or report on disposition of an aborted fetus or aborted fetal tissue for at least 10 years. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-5116; Section 16-4-108; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2; Title 62, Chapter 5; Title 63; Title 68 and Section 71-5-157.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to maintain any record or report on disposition of an aborted fetus or aborted fetal tissue for at least 10 years. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-5116; Section 16-4-108; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2; Title 62, Chapter 5; Title 63; Title 68 and Section 71-5-157.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2254 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee