TN HB2473 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the emergency communications board to include in its annual report to the governor and the speakers of the general assembly the amounts paid by the board to the state and all interest that has been diverted from the 911 Emergency Communications Fund to the state. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 86, relative to reports of the emergency communications board.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Raper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2128 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee