TN HB2465 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 599
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 599
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, names bridge on S.R. 11 in Marshall County in honor of late Matt Hayes.
Title
As enacted, names bridge on S.R. 11 in Marshall County in honor of late Matt Hayes.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Bass [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 599 | |
2012-03-05 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-03-01 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/5/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2012 | |
2012-02-23 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/23/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 1/31/2012 | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2295 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-29 - Pub. Ch. 599