TN HB2448 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to study issues related to including screening for the hepatitis C virus as a part of preventive services or as a mandated health insurance benefit for health insurance entities regulated by the department including consideration of the benefits and costs of broad based or targeted screening for the hepatitis C virus. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As enacted, requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to study issues related to including screening for the hepatitis C virus as a part of preventive services or as a mandated health insurance benefit for health insurance entities regulated by the department including consideration of the benefits and costs of broad based or targeted screening for the hepatitis C virus. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 721 | |
2018-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Action def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2413 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 721