TN HB2446 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee future of work commission. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, creates the Tennessee future of work commission. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.
Sponsors
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Jason Potts [D] | Rep. Jason Hodges [D] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1919 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee