TN HB2442 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to maintain materials designed to assist municipal solid waste region board members with administering their regions and to publish such materials on its website and send an electronic copy of the materials to the appropriate appointing authorities by July 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.
Title
As enacted, requires the department to maintain materials designed to assist municipal solid waste region board members with administering their regions and to publish such materials on its website and send an electronic copy of the materials to the appropriate appointing authorities by July 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1009 | |
2018-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2108 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1009