TN SB2108 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department to maintain materials designed to assist municipal solid waste region board members with administering their regions and to publish such materials on its website and send an electronic copy of the materials to the appropriate appointing authorities by July 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires the department to maintain materials designed to assist municipal solid waste region board members with administering their regions and to publish such materials on its website and send an electronic copy of the materials to the appropriate appointing authorities by July 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 1009
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 05/21/2018
2018-05-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-30SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-25HousePassed H., Ayes 83, Nays 1, PNV 1
2018-04-25HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0909)
2018-04-25HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-04-02HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-29SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-29SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 0, PNV 1
2018-03-29SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0824)
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018
2018-03-28SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/29/2018
2018-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018
2018-03-15SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/15/2018
2018-03-08SenateAction deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/15/2018
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2442 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1009

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback